No. 22-418
Title:Gene Deveraux, Petitioner
v.
Montana
Docketed:November 4, 2022
Linked with 22A243
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(DA 19-0671)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2022Application (22A243) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2022 to November 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2022Application (22A243) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 2, 2022.
Nov 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred Anthony Rowley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
633 W. 5th Street
Suite 1550
Los Angeles, CA 90071

fred.rowley@wsgr.com
2136839100
Party name: Gene Deveraux