No. 22-417
Title:Gary Metzgar, et al., Petitioners
v.
U.A. Plumbers and Steamfitters Local No. 22 Pension Fund, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2022
Linked with 22A182
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3791)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 18 2022Application (22A182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 31, 2022 to October 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 25 2022Application (22A182) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 28, 2022.
Oct 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2022 to January 31, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 31, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth Hopkins
    Counsel of Record
Kantor & Kantor, LLP
19839 Nordhoff Street
Northridge, CA 91324

ehopkins@kantorlaw.net
818 886-2525
Party name: Gary Metzgar, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jules L. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Blitman & King, LLP
16 West Main Street
Suite 500
Rochester, NY 14614

jlsmith@bklawyers.com
3156713130
Party name: U.A. Plumbers and Steamfitters Local No. 22 Pension Fund, et al.