No. 22-412
Title:Roy Harness, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael Watson, Mississippi Secretary of State
Docketed:November 2, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-60632)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2022 to January 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2023. See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Roy Harness, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: Michael Watson, Mississippi Secretary of State