No. 22-402
Title:James Vorley, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 31, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2251 ,21-2666)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2022Motion of United States for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3300
Party name: James Vorley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States