No. 22-401
Title:Alaska, Petitioner
v.
Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:October 31, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-35035)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 29, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Motion of Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, National Parks Conservation Association, Alaska Wilderness League, Alaskans for Wildlife, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Humane Society of the United States, Kachemak Bay Conservation Society, National Wildlife Refuge Association, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch, Copper Country Alliance, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Denali Citizens Council for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document
Nov 25 2022Motion of Debra Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, et al. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Moats Alloway
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Department of Law
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

jessie.alloway@alaska.gov
9072695108
Party name: State of Alaska
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Debra Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Other
Katherine Grace Strong
    Counsel of Record
Trustees for Alaska
121 W. Fireweed Lane
Suite 105
Anchorage, AK 99503

kstrong@trustees.org
907-433-2008
Party name: Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, National Parks Conservation Association, Alaska Wilderness League, Alaskans for Wildlife, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Humane Society of the United States, Kachemak Bay Conservation Society, National Wildlife Refuge Association, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch, Copper Country Alliance, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Denali Citizens Council