No. 22-397
Title:Maria Solange Ferrarini, Petitioner
v.
Ipek Irgit, et al.
Docketed:October 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-597)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jack Griffith Rutherford
    Counsel of Record
Rutherford Law
900 Camp Street
New Orleans, LA 70130

jgr@rfordlaw.com
(415) 794-5639
Party name: Maria Solange Ferrarini