No. 22-396
Title:Christa Fischer, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Express Corp., et al.
Docketed:October 27, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1683)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2022Waiver of right of respondent Federal Express Corp., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam William Hansen
    Counsel of Record
Apollo Law LLC
333 Washington Avenue North
Suite 300
Minneapolis, MN 55401

adam@apollo-law.com
(612) 927-2969
Party name: Christa Fischer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Frederick L. DouglasFederal Express Corporation
3620 Hacks Cross Road, Bldg. B, 3rd Floor
Memphis, TN 38125

frederick.douglas@fedex.com
901-434-8519
Party name: Federal Express Corp., et al.