No. 22-393
Vide 22-277
Title:NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al.
Docketed:October 26, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12355)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 24 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, FL Att'y Gen., et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, NetChoice, LLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 22 2022Amicus brief of Chamber of Progress; Consumer Technology Association; Engine Advocacy; Global Project Against Hate and Extremism; HONR Network; Information Technology & Innovation Foundation; Interactive Advertising Bureau; IP Justice; LGBT Tech; Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council; Safeguarding American Values for Everyone; The Software & Information Industry Association; Stop Child Predators; TechNet; and Washington Center for Technology Policy Inclusion submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Brief of FL Att'y Gen., et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of TechFreedom, National Taxpayers Union, Washington Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Former U.S. Representative Christopher Cox, Co-Author of Section 230 submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Prof. Eric Goldman submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2022Amicus brief of Floor64, Inc. D/B/A The Copia Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: NetChoice, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: FL Att'y Gen., et al.
Other
Venkat Balasubramani
    Counsel of Record
Focal PLLC
900 1st Ave. S., Suite 201
Seattle, WA 98134

venkat@focallaw.com
(206) 529-4827
Party name: Prof. Eric Goldman
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
110 Maryland Ave NE #205
Washington, DC 20002

cbarthold@techfreedom.org
2028032867
Party name: TechFreedom, National Taxpayers Union, Washington Legal Foundation
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

cathy@cgcounsel.com
2026422849
Party name: Floor64, Inc. D/B/A The Copia Institute
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Chamber of Progress; Consumer Technology Association; Engine Advocacy; Global Project Against Hate and Extremism; HONR Network; Information Technology & Innovation Foundation; Interactive Advertising Bureau; IP Justice; LGBT Tech; Multicultural Media, Telecom and Internet Council; Safeguarding American Values for Everyone; The Software & Information Industry Association; Stop Child Predators; TechNet; and Washington Center for Technology Policy Inclusion
John Cowles Neiman Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
1901 Sixth Avenue North
Suite 1700
Birmingham, AL 35213

jneiman@maynardcooper.com
2052541228
Party name: Former U.S. Representative Christopher Cox, Co-Author of Section 230
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute