No. 22-388
Title:Rodney Keister, Petitioner
v.
Stuart Bell, in His Official Capacity as President of the University of Alabama, et al.
Docketed:October 25, 2022
Linked with 22A112
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12152)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 26, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2022Application (22A112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 24, 2022 to October 23, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 09 2022Application (22A112) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 24, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Application (22A112) to extend further the time from September 24, 2022 to October 24, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestProof of Service
Sep 14 2022Application (22A112) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 24, 2022.
Oct 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022Amicus brief of American Center for Law and Justice submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Young America's Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Amicus brief of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Rodney Keister
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Young America's Foundation
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Abigail Eden Smith
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
510 Walnut Street, Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

asmith@becketlaw.org
2157173473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation