No. 22-384
Title:Bronwyn Randel, Petitioner
v.
Rabun County School District
Docketed:October 25, 2022
Linked with 22A217
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12760)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 23, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2022Application (22A217) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 21, 2022 to November 20, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 14 2022Application (22A217) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 21, 2022.
Oct 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2022 to January 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Bronwyn Randel
Attorneys for Respondent
Phillip L. Hartley
    Counsel of Record
Harben, Hartley, & Hawkins, LLP
340 Jesse Jewell Parkway
Gainesville, GA 30501

phartley@hhhlawyers.com
7705347341
Party name: Rabun County School District