No. 22-381
Vide 22-383
Title:Ashot Yegiazaryan, aka Ashot Egiazaryan, Petitioner
v.
Vitaly Ivanovich Smagin, et al.
Docketed:October 24, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55537)
   Decision Date:June 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2022Brief of respondent Vitaly Smagin in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2022Reply of petitioner Ashot Yegiazaryan filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2022Reply of petitioner CMB Monaco filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 13 2023Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-383 is GRANTED. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 13 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-381. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-381. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5120
Party name: Ashot Yegiazaryan
Michael Carl Tu
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
355 South Grand Avenue
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90071

mctu@cooley.com
(310) 883-6550
Party name: CMB Monaco
Attorneys for Respondents
Alexander David Burch
    Counsel of Record
Baker & McKenzie, LLP
700 Louisiana, Suite 3000
Houston, TX 77002

alexander.burch@bakermckenzie.com
7134275038
Party name: Vitaly Smagin