No. 22-374
Title:Troy Olhausen, Petitioner
v.
Arriva Medical, LLC, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10366)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2022 to January 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 20, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen F. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Podhurst Orseck, PA
One S.E. 3rd Ave.
Suite 2300
Miami, FL 33130

srosenthal@podhurst.com
305-358-2800
Party name: Troy Olhausen
Attorneys for Respondents
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: Arriva Medical, LLC; Alere, Inc.; and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.