No. 22-37
Title:Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Petitioner
v.
GlaxoSmithKline LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 13, 2022
Linked with 21A677
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1976, 2018-2023)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2022Application (21A677) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2022 to July 11, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 03 2022Application (21A677) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 11, 2022.
Jul 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2022 to September 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 12, 2022.
Aug 10 2022Brief amici curiae of 42 Professors of Law, Economics, Business, and Medicine filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alvotech filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2022Brief of respondents GlaxoSmithKline LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Reply of petitioner Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Juanita R. Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson
12860 El Camino Real
Suite 400
San Diego, CA 92130

brooks@fr.com
858-678-4377
Party name: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, et al.
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
2701 Calvert St NW Apt 623
Washington, DC 20008

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 525-5717
Party name: 42 Professors of Law, Economics, Business, and Medicine
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: Alvotech
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.