No. 22-361
Title:BP p.l.c., et al., Petitioners
v.
Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Docketed:October 18, 2022
Linked with 22A84
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1644)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 17, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2022Application (22A84) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Application (22A84) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 14, 2022.
Oct 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Blanket Consent
Nov 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, BP p.l.c., et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2022.
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: BP p.l.c., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Victor M. Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Edling LLP
100 Montgomery St.
Suite 1410
San Francisco, CA 94104

vic@sheredling.com
628-231-2500
Party name: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Other
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1800 K Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation