No. 22-356
Title:Everton Daye, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:October 17, 2022
Linked with 22A228
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-14340)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2022Application (22A228) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2022 to November 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Sep 13 2022Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case shouild be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Sep 15 2022Application (22A228) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 3, 2022.
Oct 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2022)
Nov 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2022 to December 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Nov 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges filed.
Nov 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield HughesMcDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

phughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Everton Daye
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick
Other
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Ave.
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges