No. 22-349
Title:Flagstar Bank, N.A., Petitioner
v.
William Kivett, et al.
Docketed:October 13, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15667)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2022Waiver of right of respondent William Kivett, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022.
Oct 27 2022Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2022)
Nov 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to December 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2022.
Nov 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Bank Policy Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2022Motion to further extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Response to motion to further extend the time to file a response from petitioner filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Motion to further extend the time to file a response denied.
Dec 08 2022Letter from counsel for petitioner regarding amendment to corporate disclosure statement filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2022Brief of respondents William Kivett, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 20 2022Reply of petitioner Flagstar Bank, N.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 03 2023Rescheduled.
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 17 2023Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: Flagstar Bank, N.A.
Other
Matthew A. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Cromwell LLP
125 Brand Street
New York, NY 10004

schwartzmatthew@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4000
Party name: The Bank Policy Institute, American Bankers Association, Consumer Bankers Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Mortgage Bankers Association