No. 22-340 | |
Title: | Mark E. Pulsifer, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | October 12, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1609) |
Decision Date: | July 11, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 07 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2022 to December 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2022. |
Dec 07 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 08 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 13, 2023. |
Jan 13 2023 | Brief for the United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. |
Feb 02 2023 | Reply of petitioner Mark E. Pulsifer filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 21 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023. |
Feb 22 2023 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Mark E. Pulsifer filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Shay Dvoretzky Counsel of Record | Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP 1440 New York Ave., NW Washington, DC 20005 shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com | 202-371-7370 |
Party name: Mark E. Pulsifer | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |