No. 22-336
Title:Jason Reed, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2073)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 10, 2022 to December 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2022.
Nov 10 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Jason Reed
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Peter Bert Siegal
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

peter.siegal@nortonrosefulbright.com
(202) 662-4663
Party name: National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers