No. 22-327
Title:Confederación Hípica de Puerto Rico, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Confederación de Jinetes Puertorriqueños, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2201, 20-2172)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 7, 2022 to December 22, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 03 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Nov 03 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Confederación Hípica de Puerto Rico, Inc.; Camarero Racetrack Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Axel A. Vizcarra-PellotVizcarra-Pellot Law Office
5900 Isla Verde Ave.
L2-362
Carolina, PR 00979

axelvizcarra@icloud.com
787-727-3000
Party name: Confederación de Jinetes Puertorriqueños, Inc., et al.
Other
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America