No. 22-324
Title:Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff, et al., Petitioners
v.
Christopher Garnier, et ux.
Docketed:October 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55118, 21-55157)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 7, 2022 to December 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2022.
Nov 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2022 to December 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 13, 2022.
Dec 13 2022Brief of respondents Christopher Garnier, et ux. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 20 2022Reply of petitioners Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff, et al. filed. (To be recovered - corrected version received and distributed December 27, 2022) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 04 2023Rescheduled.
Mar 14 2023Supplemental brief of petitioners Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff and T.J. Zane filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 24 2023Petition GRANTED.
May 01 2023Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 23, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2023.
Jun 23 2023Brief of petitioners Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff and T.J. Zane filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 23 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of The State of Tennessee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of California School Boards Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of NetChoice, et al. supporting neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of The State of Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of The NRSC filed (also in 22-611). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, et al. supporting neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed (also in 22-611). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2023Brief of respondents Christopher Garnier and Kimberly Garnier filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Atheists, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Protect The First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Clinics, Citizens and Journalists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 31, 2023.
Sep 06 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Sep 06 2023CIRCULATED.
Sep 07 2023Reply of petitioners Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Sep 29 2023Record from the United States District Court for the Southern District of California received electronically and available with the Clerk. Sealed material available with the Clerk.
Oct 02 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 31 2023Argued. For petitioners: Hashim M. Mooppan, Washington, D. C.; and Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Pamela S. Karlan, Stanford, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Hashim M. Mooppan
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

hmmooppan@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Michelle O’Connor-Ratcliff and T.J. Zane
Attorneys for Respondents
Cory Jay Briggs
    Counsel of Record
Briggs Law Corporation
99 East C Street
Suite 203
Upland, CA 91786

CORY@BRIGGSLAWCORP.COM
909-949-7115
Party name: Christopher Garnier and Kimberly Garnier
Pamela Susan KarlanStanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Christopher Garnier and Kimberly Garnier
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
1517 N. Stillman St.
#2
Philadelphia, PA 19121

LEGAL@ATHEISTS.ORG
(908) 276-7300
Party name: American Atheists, Inc.
Jeremy Joseph Broggi
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

JBROGGI@WILEY.LAW
8438121527
Party name: The NRSC
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
44180 Riverside Pkwy
Lansdowne, VA 20176

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Manhattan Institute
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, AND THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave SE. Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

BOBCORNREVERE@DWT.COM
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Peter K. Fagen
    Counsel of Record
Fagen Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP
1525 Faraday Avenue
Suite 300
Carlsbad, CA 92008

pfagen@f3law.com
760-304-6000
Party name: California School Boards Association
David Morris Gossett
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street NW
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

davidgossett@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: NetChoice, the Cato Institute, Chamber of Progress and the Computer and Communications Industry Association
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

DAVIDG@EFF.ORG
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Gregg P. Leslie
    Counsel of Record
ASU College of Law First Amendment Clinic
111 E. Taylor St.
Mailcode 8820
Phoenix, AZ 85004

GREGG.LESLIE@ASU.EDU
480-727-7398
Party name: First Amendment Clinics, Citizens and Journalists
Caroline Payseur Mackie
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
P.O. Box 1801
Raleigh, NC 27602-1801

cmackie@poynerspruill.com
919-783-1108
Party name: Local Government Legal Center, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, and the International Municipal Lawyers Association
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
James Matthew Rice
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

MATT.RICE@AG.TN.GOV
615-532-6026
Party name: The State of Tennessee, et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect The First Foundation