No. 22-323
Title:Oakbrook Land Holdings, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:October 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2117)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 7, 2022 to December 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2022.
Nov 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of GBX Group LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Taxpayers Union Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David William Foster
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

david.foster@skadden.com
202-371-7626
Party name: Oakbrook Land Holdings, LLC, William Duane Horton, Tax Matters Partner
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#700
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Katherine Schadler Jordan
    Counsel of Record
GBX Group LLC
2101 Superior Ave. E.
Cleveland, OH 44114

kjordan@gbxgroup.com
9194527949
Party name: GBX Group LLC
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Silicon Valley Tax Directors Group