No. 22-321
Title:Wilbur Slockish, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Transportation, et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2022
Linked with 22A49
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-35220)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2022Application (22A49) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 4, 2022 to October 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Application (22A49) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 3, 2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States Department of Transportation, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2022 to December 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2022.
Nov 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Religious Liberty Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2022 to January 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 4, 2023.
Dec 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2023 to February 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 3, 2023.
Jan 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 3, 2023.
Feb 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2023 to April 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Luke W. Goodrich
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

lgoodrich@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Wilbur Slockish, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Transportation, et al.
Other
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
8643732352
Party name: Religious Liberty Law Scholars
Joshua Craig McDaniel
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Religious Freedom Clinic
6 Everett St., Suite 5110
Cambridge, MA 02138

jmcdaniel@law.harvard.edu
6174964383
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, Sikh Coalition, American Islamic Congress, and Protect the First Foundation