No. 22-312
Title:Michelle Chapman, Clerk, Circuit Court of Missouri, Randolph County, Petitioner
v.
Jane Doe, by Next Friend Anthony E. Rothert
Docketed:October 4, 2022
Linked with 22A146
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1692)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 15 2022Application (22A146) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 31, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 18 2022Application (22A146) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 30, 2022.
Sep 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent Jane Doe, by Next Friend Anthony E. Rothert to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 04 2022Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeff Philip Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
815 Olive Street, Suite 200
Saint Louis, MO 63101

jeff.johnson@ago.mo.gov
3143407366
Party name: Michelle Chapman
Attorneys for Respondent
Anthony Edward Rothert
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union of Missouri
906 Olive Street
Suite 1130
St. Louis, MO 63101

arothert@aclu-mo.org
6185314184
Party name: Jane Doe, by Next Friend Anthony E. Rothert