No. 22-278
Title:City of Ocala, Florida, Petitioner
v.
Art Rojas, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12679)
   Decision Date:July 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2022 to November 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 28, 2022.
Nov 28 2022Brief of respondents Art Rojas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 12 2022Reply of petitioner City of Ocala, Florida filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 03 2023Rescheduled.
Jan 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: City of Ocala, Florida
Attorneys for Respondents
Ayesha N. Khan
    Counsel of Record
Potomac Law Group, PLLC
1300 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

akhan@potomaclaw.com
2028367136
Party name: Art Rojas & Lucinda Hale
Monica Lynn Miller
    Counsel of Record
American Humanist Association
1821 Jefferson Place NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmiller@americanhumanist.org
2022389088
Party name: Art Rojas, et al.