No. 22-277
Title:Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al., Petitioners
v.
NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2022
Linked with 22A131
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12355)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2022Application (22A131) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2022 to September 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Application (22A131) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 21, 2022.
Sep 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Netchoice, LLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Donald J. Trump filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Attorney General, Florida, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 24 2022Brief amici curiae of Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief of respondents Netchoice, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Freedom X filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Philip Hamburger in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2022Reply of petitioners Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 29 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 23 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the Solicitor General in her brief for the United States as amicus curiae.
Oct 10 2023The following briefing schedule is adopted: Respondents in No. 22-277 and petitioners in No. 22-555 shall file opening briefs on the merits on or before Thursday, November 30, 2023, and the briefs shall bear a light blue cover. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support or in support of neither party shall be filed on or before Thursday, December 7, 2023, and the brief shall bear a light green cover. Petitioners in No. 22-277 and respondents in No. 22-555 shall file response briefs on the merits on or before Tuesday, January 16, 2024, and those briefs shall bear a light red cover. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support shall be filed on or before Tuesday, January 23, 2024, and the briefs shall bear a dark green cover. Reply briefs shall be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3, and the briefs shall bear a yellow cover. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief in these cases.
Nov 30 2023Brief of respondents Netchoice, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of Media Law Resource Center, Inc. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Eric Goldman filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Internet Works, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors Richard L. Hasen, Brendan Nyhan, and Amy Wilentz filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amici curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Bluesky, a Public Benefit Corporation, M. Chris Riley, an individual, and Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amici curiae of First Amendment and Internet Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Amicus brief of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in Support of Neither Party not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted--December 14, 2023)
Dec 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in Support of Neither Party (December 14, 2023) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Yelp Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Knowledge filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Internet Society filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Economists in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Representative Christopher Cox and Senator Ron Wyden filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Senator Ben Ray Luján filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Article 19: Global Campaign for Free Expression, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Reddit, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Discord Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors of History filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Marketplace Industry Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of National Security Experts in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Reason Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Center for Social Media and Politics at New York University, et al. in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of PEN American Center and Library Futures filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Developers Alliance, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Wikimedia Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Amicus brief of International Center for Law & Economics not accepted for filing. (Corrected electronic and paper briefs to be submitted--December 11, 2023)
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of International Center for Law & Economics filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Francis Fukuyama filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Progress, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Business and Human Rights of the Leonard N. Stern School of Business at New York University In support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Trust & Safety Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Christopher S. Yoo filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Anti-Defamation League in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Center for Growth and Opportunity, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amici curiae of Moderators of R/Law and R/Scotus filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center supporting neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 26, 2024.
Jan 10 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit.
Jan 10 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 16 2024Brief of petitioners Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Digital Progress Institute filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Christos A. Makridis filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2024Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars Adam Candeub, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Brief amici curiae of Missouri, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of Keep the Republic filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of World Faith Foundation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Heartland Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2024Brief amicus curiae of Center for renewing America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 23 2024Brief amici curiae of Moms for Liberty, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amici curiae of iTexasPolitics, LLC d/b/a The Texan, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Principles Project filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Children’s Health Defense filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Eric Rasmusen filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Donald J. Trump filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Center for American Liberty filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Donald W. Landry filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amici curiae of Babylon Bee and Not the Bee filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Open Markets Institute filed (Jan. 30, 2024.) VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Amicus Populi filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2024Reply of respondents Netchoice, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Netchoice, LLC, et al.
Other
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: Eric Rasmusen
Richard A. Epstein
    Counsel of Record
16 Thomas Place
Norwalk, CT 06853

repstein@uchicago.edu
773-450-4476
Party name: Center for Renewing America
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Joel Bernard Ard
    Counsel of Record
Ard Law Group PLLC
PO Box 11633
Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

joel@ard.law
2067019243
Party name: Donald W. Landry
Ian C. Ballon
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
1840 Century Park East
Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067

ballon@gtlaw.com
310-586-7700
Party name: The Trust & Safety Foundation
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
1500 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

CBARTHOLD@TECHFREEDOM.ORG
7712004997
Party name: TechFreedom
John David Bergmayer
    Counsel of Record
Public Knowledge
1818 N. St. NW
Suite 410
Washington, DC 20036

john@publicknowledge.org
(202) 861-0020
Party name: Public Knowledge
Benjamin William Berkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Keker & Van Nest LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

BBERKOWITZ@KEKER.COM
4153915400
Party name: Engine Advocacy
Thomas Arthur Berry
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

tberry@cato.org
(202) 789-5202
Party name: Cato Institute
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

TBOUTROUS@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Professors of History
Mark William Brennan
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

MARK.BRENNAN@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
2026376409
Party name: Chamber of Progress et al.
David Ryan Brody
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20016

DBRODY@LAWYERSCOMMITTEE.ORG
(202) 662-8320
Party name: The Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bruce.brown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al.
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
John Purcell Coale
    Counsel of Record
2901 Fessenden St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

johnpcoale@aol.com
2022552096
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Megan Marie Coker
    Counsel of Record
Tillotson Johnson & Patton LLP
1201 Main Street
Suite 1300
Dallas, TX 75202

mcoker@tillotsonlaw.com
214-382-3041
Party name: Article 19: Global Campaign for Free Expression
Theodore Mark Cooperstein
    Counsel of Record
Clouthier Cooperstein PLLC
1020 Highland Colony Parkway
Suite 803
Ridgeland, MS 39157

ted@msappellatelawyers.com
6013972471
Party name: American Principles Project
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

bob.corn-revere@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
4201 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22203

CCRAWFORD@AFPHQ.ORG
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Joshua Michael Divine
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: States Missouri, Ohio, Alaska, Alabama, Arkansas, Iowa, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, New Hampshire, N. Dakota, Oklahoma, S. Carolina, S. Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, Virginia, AZ Legislature
George Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Media Law Resource Center, Inc.
266 West 37th Street
20th Floor
New York, NY 10018

gfreeman@medialaw.org
(212) 337-0200
Party name: Media Law Resource Center, Inc.
Steven M. Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Anti-Defamation League
605 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10158

sfreeman@adl.org
2128857700
Party name: The Anti-Defamation League
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

CATHY@CGCOUNSEL.COM
2026422849
Party name: Bluesky, a Public Benefit Corporation, M. Chris Riley, an individual, and Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute
Timothy Kelso Gilman
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

Tim.Gilman@srz.com
(212) 756-2000
Party name: The Center for Business and Human Rights of the Leonard N. Stern School of Business at New York University
Evan Miles Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Evan Miles Goldberg, PLLC
400 East 57th Street, Ste. 4M
New York, NY 10022

egoldberg@emglawfirm.com
212-888-6497
Party name: iTexasPolitics, LLC d/b/a The Texan and PowerHouse Management, Inc.
Jonathan Shae Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein Law Partners, LLC
11 Church Road
Hatfield, PA 19440

jgoldstein@goldsteinlp.com
610-949-0444
Party name: Dr. Christos A. Makridis
David Morris Gossett
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street NW
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

davidgossett@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: Former Representative Christopher Cox and Senator Ron Wyden
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

DAVIDG@EFF.ORG
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al.
Seth D. Greenstein
    Counsel of Record
Constantine Cannon LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 1300 North
Washington, DC 20004

sgreenstein@constantinecannon.com
202-204-3514
Party name: Francis Fukuyama
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue N.W.
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

AGURA@IFS.ORG
202.301.3300
Party name: Moms for Liberty, Institute for Free Speech
Gautam Singh Hans
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
Myron Taylor Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

gshans@cornell.edu
(607) 254-5994
Party name: First Amendment and Internet Law Scholars
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

KHARTNETT@COOLEY.COM
(415) 493-2071
Party name: Wikimedia Foundation
Richard Hasen
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Drive East
Los Angeles, CA 90095

hasen@law.ucla.edu
3102063103
Party name: Professors Richard L. Hasen, Brendan Nyhan, and Amy Wilentz
Michael Jason HendershotOhio Attorney General's Office
30 E. Broad Street, 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

michael.hendershot@ohioago.gov
614.466.8980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Iowa, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah
Jay L. Himes
    Counsel of Record
50 East 89th Street Apt 12F
New York, NY 10128

jlhimes@gmail.com
6468086135
Party name: Open Markets Institute
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
(714) 283-8880
Party name: World Faith Foundation
Mary Holland
    Counsel of Record
Children's Health Defense
853 Franklin Avenue, Suite 511
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417

MARY.HOLLAND@CHILDRENSHEALTHDEFENSE.ORG
2028541310
Party name: Children’s Health Defense
Ari Benjamin Asher Holtzblatt
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

ARI.HOLTZBLATT@WILMERHALE.COM
(202) 663-6964
Party name: Developers Alliance and Software & Information Industry Association
Eric Alan Hudson
    Counsel of Record
Terrazas PLLC
1001 S. Capital of Texas Hwy
Austin, TX 78746

ehudson@terrazaspllc.com
15122949891
Party name: Keep the Republic
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JHUEBERT@LIBERTYJUSTICECENTER.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Michael Robert Huston
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
2901 North Central Avenue
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012-2788

mhuston@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1630
Party name: Reddit, Inc.
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

EJAFFE@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Reason Foundation; Committee for Justice; Competitive Enterprise Institute; Taxpayers Protection Alliance
Jean-Paul Jassy
    Counsel of Record
Jassy Vick Carolan LLP
355 South Grand Avenue
Suite 2450
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jpjassy@jassyvick.com
310-870-7048
Party name: Internet Works, Glassdoor, LLC, Indeed, Inc., Nextdoor, Inc., Mozilla Corporation, Pinterest, Inc., Tripadvisor, LLC, Tumblr, Inc., Vimeo, Inc.
Jacob Mandell Karr
    Counsel of Record
Washington Square Legal Svcs at NYU Sch of Law
245 Sullivan Street, Room 511
New York, NY 10012

jmk858@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6042
Party name: Center for Social Media and Politics at New York University et al.
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Amicus Populi
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Freedom X
Raechel Keay Kummer
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

RAECHEL.KUMMER@MORGANLEWIS.COM
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Internet Society
Michael Soonuk Kwun
    Counsel of Record
Kwun Bhansali Lazarus LLP
555 Montgomery St
Suite 750
San Francisco, CA 94111

MKWUN@KBLFIRM.COM
415-630-2350
Party name: Professor Eric Goldman
Gabriel Akiva Zabow Latner
    Counsel of Record
Advocan Law LLP
157 Adelaide Street W
#300
Toronto, Ontario, Canada, XX M5H 4E7

gabriel@advocan.ca
6477454090
Party name: Moderators of R/Law and R/Scotus
James Ruffin Lawrence III
    Counsel of Record
Envisage Law
2601 Oberlin Road Suite 100
Raleigh, NC 27608

jlawrence@envisage.law
919.755.1317
Party name: The Heartland Institute
Richard LawsonGardner Brewer Hudson
400 N. Ashley Dr.
Tampa, FL 33602

RLAWSON@GARDNERBREWER.COM
813-952-8882
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Tyler Leandro Martinez
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20001

TMARTINEZ@NTU.ORG
703-683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
Complex Appellate Litigation Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calg.com
4156496700
Party name: Yelp Inc.
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: National Security Experts
Randall Wilson Miller
    Counsel of Record
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr
500 N. Akard Street, Suite 4000
Dallas, TX 75201

rwmiller@munsch.com
214.855.7500
Party name: The Center for American Liberty
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Philip Hamburger
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
Aaron Edgar Nathan
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

anathan@willkie.com
2023031172
Party name: American Jewish Committee
Andrew C. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Charis Lex P.C.
11921 Freedom Dr., Ste. 550
Reston, VA 20190

anichols@charislex.com
(571) 549-2645
Party name: Center for Growth and Opportunity, et al.
Lynn Oberlander
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1675 Broadway,19th Floor
New York, NY 10019

OBERLANDERL@BALLARDSPAHR.COM
(212) 223-0200
Party name: PEN American Center and Library Futures
Kelly Marita Percival
    Counsel of Record
Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
268 Bush St. #555
San Francisco, CA 94104

kpercival@giffords.org
(415) 433-2062
Party name: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Constance Lynn Pfeiffer
    Counsel of Record
Yetter Coleman LLP
811 Main Street, Suite 4100
Houston, TX 77002

cpfeiffer@yettercoleman.com
713-632-8000
Party name: International Center for Law & Economics
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ERASSBACH@BECKETLAW.ORG
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the First Foundation
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O' Melveny & Myers
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

JSCHNELLER@OMM.COM
213-430-8115
Party name: The United States Chamber of Commerce
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
James Michael Showalter
    Counsel of Record
ArentFox Schiff LLP
233 S Wacker Dr., Suite 7100
Chicago, IL 60606

j.michael.showalter@afslaw.com
3122585561
Party name: U.S. Senator Ben Ray Luján
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Antonin Scalia Law School Supreme Court Clinic
1600 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

PATRICK@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
7032439423
Party name: Babylon Bee and Not the Bee
Jennifer Beth Tatel
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Barker Knauer LLP
1800 M Street NW
Suite 800N
Washington, DC 20036

JTATEL@WBKLAW.COM
2023833344
Party name: Economists of Technology Policy Institute
Joel L Thayer
    Counsel of Record
Digital Progress Institute
1255 Union Street NE, Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20002

jthayer@thayer.tech
7606680934
Party name: The Digital Progress Institute
Rebecca Leah Tushnet
    Counsel of Record
Lex Lumina PLLC
745 5th Avenue, Suite 500
New York, NY 10151

rtushnet@lex-lumina.com
6468982055
Party name: Discord Inc.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, Arizona, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawai‘I, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, North Carolina, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Washington, and Wisconsin, and the District of Columbia
Kenneth James Weatherwax
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein & Weatherwax LLP
1016 Pico Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90405

weatherwax@lowensteinweatherwax.com
310-307-4500
Party name: Legal Scholars Adam Candeub & Adam MacLeod
Walter M. WeberAmerican Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002-5703

WMWEBER@ACLJ-DC.ORG
703.639.0775
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Scott Block Wilkens
    Counsel of Record
Knight First Amend. Inst. at Columbia Univ.
475 Riverside Drive
Suite 302
New York, NY 10115

SCOTT.WILKENS@KNIGHTCOLUMBIA.ORG
6467458500
Party name: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Eric B. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101-3029

ewolff@perkinscoie.com
206-359-3779
Party name: Marketplace Industry Association; Etsy, Inc.; OfferUp, Inc.; and eBay, Inc.
Christopher Seung-gil Yoo
    Counsel of Record
University of Pennsylvania Carey Law School
3501 Sansom St.
Philadelphia, PA 19104-6204

csyoo@law.upenn.edu
(215) 746-8772
Party name: Professor Christopher S. Yoo