No. 22-274
Title:Steven Donziger, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2486)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 17 2022Response Requested. (Due November 16, 2022)
Nov 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2022 to December 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2022.
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jennifer L. Mascott filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Steven Donziger
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jennifer Lee Mascott
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

jmascott@gmu.edu
703-993-8168
Party name: Professor Jennifer L. Mascott