No. 22-265
Title:Christopher N. Caputo, Petitioner
v.
Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC
Docketed:September 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3059)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 17, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Waiver of right of respondent Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 25 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Christopher N. Caputo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2022Petition DENIED.
Nov 22 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy William Bergin
    Counsel of Record
Potomac Law Group, PLLC
1300 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

tbergin@potomaclaw.com
703-447-4032
Party name: Christopher N. Caputo
Attorneys for Respondent
Megan M. ChristensenStevens & Lee, PC
100 Lenox Drive, Suite 200
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

megan.christensen@stevenslee.com
609-987-5330
Party name: Wells Fargo Advisors, LLC