No. 22-252
Title:Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Petitioner
v.
DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 16, 2022
Linked with 22A4
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55126)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 16, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2022Application (22A4) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 14, 2022 to September 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Jun 30 2022Application (22A4) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 14, 2022.
Sep 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 17, 2022 to November 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 16, 2022.
Nov 16 2022Brief of respondents DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Nov 21 2022Reply of petitioner Howmedica Osteonics Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Anthony B. Haller
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
One Logan Square
130 N. 18th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

Anthony.Haller@blankrome.com
215-569-5690
Party name: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al.