No. 22-250
Title:Matthew Brach, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al.
Docketed:September 16, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-56291)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2022Waiver of right of respondent Gavin Newsom, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Oct 28 2022Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2022)
Nov 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 28, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
177 Post Street, Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94108

harmeet@dhillonlaw.com
4154331700
Party name: Matthew Brach, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3917
Party name: Gavin Newsom, et al.