No. 22-242
Title:Cyrano R. Irons, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 14, 2022
Linked with 21A815
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2750)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 09 2022Application (21A815) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2022 to September 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Application (21A815) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 13, 2022.
Sep 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 27 2022Response Requested. (Due October 27, 2022)
Oct 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 27, 2022 to November 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 28, 2022.
Nov 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to December 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 5, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dan Phillip Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1000 Walnut, Suite 600
Kansas City, MO 64106

dan_goldberg@fd.org
816-471-8282
Party name: Cyrano Irons
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America