No. 22-238
Title:Charter Day School, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Bonnie Peltier, as Guardian of A. P., a Minor Child, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1001, 20-1023)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Charter Day School, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022.
Oct 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of John Locke Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Arlington, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Timothy K. Moore, Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Great Hearts Academies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2022 to December 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2022.
Dec 07 2022Brief of respondents Bonnie Peltier, as Guardian of A. P., a Minor Child, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2022Reply of petitioners Charter Day School, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: Charter Day School, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
ACLU
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

rmar@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Bonnie Peltier, as Guardian of A.P., a minor child; Erika Booth, as Guardian of I.B., a minor child; and Keely Burks
Other
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
202-828-2887
Party name: Timothy K. Moore, Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, and Philip E. Berger, President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Arlington, Inc.
Robert Daniel Gibson
    Counsel of Record
Stam Law Firm
510 W. Williams Street
Apex, NC 27502

dan@stamlawfirm.com
919-362-8873
Party name: John Locke Foundation
John Archer Meiser
    Counsel of Record
Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Clinic
1338 Biolchini Hall
Notre Dame, IN 46556

jmeiser@nd.edu
574-631-3880
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, Islam & Religious Freedom Action Team of the Religious Freedom Institute, and Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Clinic
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Kansas, Mississippi, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, and Virginia
Kathryn Elizabeth Tarbert
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ktarbert@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin,LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 22305

gtodd@sidley.com
2027368760
Party name: Great Hearts Academies