No. 22-237
Title:Sandra K. Nieveen, Petitioner
v.
TAX 106, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-21-364)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 22, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Waiver of right of respondents Rachel Glover, Lancaster County Treasurer & Lancaster County to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Douglas J. Peterson, Attorney General of Nebraska to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New England Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Sandra K. Nieveen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022.
Oct 26 2022Response Requested. (Due November 25, 2022)
Nov 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2022 to December 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2022, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Sandra K. Nieveen
Attorneys for Respondents
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: Douglas J. Peterson, Attorney General of the State of Nebraska
Christian R. BlunkHarris & Associates Law Firm
1005 S. 107th Avenue, Suite 100
Omaha, NE 68114

cblunk@harrislawomaha.com
402-397-1200
Party name: TAX 106 and Vintage Mgt. LLC
Eric SynowickiLancaster County Attorney's Office
605 S 10th Street, Second Floor
Lincoln, NE 68508

402-441-7321
Party name: Rachel Glover, Lancaster County Treasurer & Lancaster County
Other
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
333 Washington Street
Suite 850
Boston, MA 02108

JPagliaro@newenglandlegal.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation