No. 22-235
Title:Paul S. Morrissey, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2022
Linked with 21A741
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5024, 20-5042)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2022Application (21A741) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2022 to September 9, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 20 2022Application (21A741) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2022.
Sep 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022.
Oct 13 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professors of Civil Procedure.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2022 to December 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 2, 2022.
Nov 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2022 to December 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Paul S. Morrissey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mayorkas, Alejandro N., et al.
Other
Jonathan Benjmain Amarilio
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60601

jamarilio@taftlaw.com
3125274000
Party name: Professors of Civil Procedure