No. 22-234
Title:Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2561)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022, for all respondents.
Nov 09 2022Brief of respondents Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. and Cook County, Illinois in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2022Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1 S. Dearborn St.
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
312-853-7875
Party name: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.; Cook County, Illinois
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States