No. 22-231
Title:Artur Davis, Petitioner
v.
Legal Services Alabama, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2022
Linked with 21A863
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12886-BB)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 14, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2022Application (21A863) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 13, 2022 to September 11, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 27 2022Application (21A863) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 12, 2022.
Jul 29 2022Application (21A863) to extend further the time from August 12, 2022 to September 9, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestWritten Request
Aug 03 2022Application (21A863) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 9, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Waiver of right of respondent Legal Services Alabama, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 06 2022Response Requested. (Due November 7, 2022)
Oct 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 7, 2022 to December 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2022.
Dec 06 2022Brief of respondents Legal Services Alabama, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2022Reply of petitioner Artur Davis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
2026616582
Party name: Artur Davis
Attorneys for Respondents
Albert Loring Vreeland II
    Counsel of Record
Lehr Middlebrooks, et al.
1914 Fourth Avenue North
Suite 500
Birmingham, AL 35203

avreeland@lehrmiddlebrooks.com
2053239266
Party name: Legal Services Alabama, et al.