No. 22-227 | |
Title: | Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al., Petitioners v. Brian W. Coughlin |
Docketed: | September 12, 2022 |
Linked with 22A23 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1153) |
Decision Date: | May 6, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 08 2022 | Application (22A23) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 4, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jul 13 2022 | Application (22A23) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 8, 2022. |
Sep 08 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2022 to November 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022. See Rule 30.1. |
Oct 12 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Federal Indian Law filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 12 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Native American Financial Services Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 08 2022 | Brief of respondent Brian W. Coughlin in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 22 2022 | Reply of petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 30 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
Jan 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. |
Jan 13 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
Jan 31 2023 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 24, 2023. |
Feb 08 2023 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A.-1st Circuit. |
Feb 16 2023 | All records from the U.S.C.A.-1st Circuit are available on PACER. Record request was transmitted to the Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court for response. |
Feb 16 2023 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 22 2023 | Brief of petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 01 2023 | Brief amici curiae of The Navajo Nation, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 01 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 06 2023 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. |
Mar 10 2023 | All records from the Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court are available on PACER. |
Mar 24 2023 | CIRCULATED |
Mar 24 2023 | Brief of respondent Brian W. Coughlin filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 30 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 30 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 31 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed) |
Certificate of Word CountMain Document | |
Mar 31 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Separation of Powers Clinic filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 31 2023 | Brief amici curiae of NACBA, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 31 2023 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 13 2023 | Reply of petitioners Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2023 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
Apr 24 2023 | Argued. For petitioners: Pratik A. Shah, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Gregory G. Rapawy, Washington, D. C.; and Austin Raynor, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Pratik Arvind Shah Counsel of Record | Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP 2001 K Street N.W. Washington, DC 20006 pshah@akingump.com | 202-887-4210 |
Party name: Lac du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Gregory Gerber Rapawy Counsel of Record | Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C. 1615 M Street, N.W. Suite 400 Washington, DC 20036 grapawy@kellogghansen.com | 202-326-7967 |
Party name: Brian W. Coughlin | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
George Eric Brunstad Jr. Counsel of Record | Dechert LLP 199 Lawrence Street New Haven, CT 06511 ERIC.BRUNSTAD@DECHERT.COM | 8605243960 |
Party name: NACBA, NCBRC, Legal Aid Chicago, Hon. Judith Fitzgerald, Hon. Joan Feeney, Hon. Phillip Shefferly, Hon. Eugene Wedoff, Hon. Steven Rhodes and Hon. Carol Kenner | ||
Daniel J. Bussel | KTBS Law LLP 1801 Century Park East 26th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90067 DBUSSEL@KTBSLAW.COM | 3104074015 |
Party name: National Assn of Consumer Bankruptcy Attorneys and National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center | ||
Tyson Clinton Kade Counsel of Record | Van Ness Feldman, LLP 1050 Thomas Jefferson Street, NW, Seventh Floor Washington, DC 20007 tck@vnf.com | 2022981948 |
Party name: Native American Financial Services Association | ||
Lawrence A. Kogan Counsel of Record | The Kogan Law Group, P.C. 100 United Nations Plaza Suite #14F New York, NY 10017 LKOGAN@KOGANLAWGROUP.COM | (917)565-1521 |
Party name: Citizens Equal Rights Foundation | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Antonin Scalia Law School/George Mason University 3301 Fairfax Dr. Arlington, VA 22201 rmccotte@gmu.edu | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Separation of Powers Clinic | ||
Kaighn Smith Jr. | Drummond Woodsum & MacMahon 84 Marginal Way Suite 600 Portland, ME 04101 KSMITH@DWMLAW.COM | 207-253-0559 |
Party name: Professors of Federal Indian Law | ||
Paul Wesley Spruhan Counsel of Record | Navajo Naton Department of Justice P.O. Box 2010 Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515 PSPRUHAN@NNDOJ.ORG | 928-871-6210 |
Party name: The Navajo Nation | ||
April Dennise Youpee-Roll Counsel of Record | 4146 4th Ave Los Angeles, CA 90008 april.youpee.roll@gmail.com | 406-396-3147 |
Party name: Professors of Federal Indian Law | ||
Allison M. Zieve Counsel of Record | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th Street NW Washington, DC 20009 AZIEVE@CITIZEN.ORG | 202-588-1000 |
Party name: Public Citizen, National Consumer Law Center, and National Ass'n of Consumer Advocates |