No. 22-22
Title:David A. Tropp, Petitioner
v.
Travel Sentry, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2022
Linked with 21A657
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1908, 2021-1909)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2022Application (21A657) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to June 14, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 28 2022Application (21A657) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 14, 2022.
Jun 01 2022Application (21A657) to extend further the time from June 14, 2022 to July 5, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 06 2022Application (21A657) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 5, 2022.
Jul 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2022 to September 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2022, for all respondents.
Aug 05 2022Brief amici curiae of US Inventor and Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022Brief of respondents Travel Sentry, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2022Reply of petitioner David A. Tropp filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Oct 03 2022Rescheduled.
Oct 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 17 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan White
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

eawhite@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3091
Party name: David A. Tropp
Attorneys for Respondents
William Prickett
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
Two Seaport Lane
Suite 1200
Boston, MA 02110

wprickett@seyfarth.com
617-946-4902
Party name: Travel Sentry, Inc., et al.
Other
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: US Inventor and Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund