No. 22-210
Title:Neil Dupree, Petitioner
v.
Kevin Younger
Docketed:September 8, 2022
Linked with 21A734
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6423)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 8, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2022Application (21A734) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2022 to September 5, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2022Application (21A734) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 5, 2022.
Sep 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kevin Younger to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 22 2022Response Requested. (Due October 24, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Neil Dupree
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel A. Griffith
    Counsel of Record
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
Courthouse Square, Suite 300
600 N. King Street
Wilmington, DE 19801-3700

dgriffith@wtplaw.com
302-357-3254
Party name: Kevin Younger