No. 22-205
Title:Demetrios Stavrakis, aka Dimitrios Stavrakis, aka Jimmy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 7, 2022
Linked with 21A852
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4149, 20-4184)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2022Application (21A852) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jun 27 2022Application (21A852) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 2, 2022.
Sep 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard Milton Srebnick
    Counsel of Record
Black Srebnick
201 S. Biscayne Boulevard
Suite 1300
Miami, FL 33131

HSrebnick@royblack.com
(305) 371-6421
Party name: Demetrios Stavrakis
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States