No. 22-204
Title:Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Docketed:September 7, 2022
Linked with 22A73
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(A159899)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 5, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2022Application (22A73) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Application (22A73) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 2, 2022.
Sep 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Melissa Elaine Klein, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Blanket Consent
Sep 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022.
Sep 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Masterpiece Cakeshop Customers Stephanie Luck, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2022Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Amicus brief of Constitutional Attorneys submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2022Amicus brief of Liberty Justice Center submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Amicus brief of Advancing American Freedom, Inc. submitted.
Main Document
Oct 07 2022Amicus brief of United States Senators and Representatives submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Amicus brief of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Christian Legal Society, Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty, and Coalition for Jewish Values submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Amicus brief of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mccotter@boydengrayassociates.com
202-706-5488
Party name: Melissa Elaine Klein, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Other
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Def. Foundation
8001 Braddock Road
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
7573524522
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Christian Legal Society, Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty, and Coalition for Jewish Values
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Ste 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

jon@whiteheadlawllc.com
18163988305
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Attorneys
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 324-1812
Party name: Constitutional Attorneys
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave
New York City, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute, Committee for Justice, and Cato Institute
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Suite 2
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-322-3207
Party name: Masterpiece Cakeshop Customers Stephanie Luck, et al.
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 200042729

mwheat@advancingamericanfreedom.com
202-780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.