No. 22-203
Title:Apple Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
California Institute of Technology
Docketed:September 7, 2022
Linked with 22A18
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2222, 2021-1527)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 9, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2022Application (22A18) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jul 14 2022Application (22A18) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 2, 2022.
Sep 02 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2022Waiver of right of respondent California Institute of Technology to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Patent Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Unified Patents, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 13 2022Response Requested. (Due November 14, 2022)
Oct 24 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2022 to December 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2022.
Dec 14 2022Brief of respondent California Institute of Technology in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2022Reply of petitioners Apple, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 17 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale, LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

William.Lee@wilmerhale.com
617 526 6556
Party name: Apple, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
865 S. Figueroa St.
10th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(213) 443-3000
Party name: California Institute of Technology
Other
William G. Jenks
    Counsel of Record
Jenks IP Law
1610 Allen St
Reno, NV 89509

wjenks@jenksiplaw.com
2024127964
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC
Christa Jordan Laser
    Counsel of Record
Cleveland-Marshall College of Law
2121 Euclid Avenue, LB163
Cleveland, OH 44115-2214

c.j.laser@csuohio.edu
216-687-2529
Party name: Patent Law Professors