No. 22-196
Title:Adam Samia, aka Sal, aka Adam Samic, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 1, 2022
Linked with 22A20
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3074)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2022Application (22A20) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 19, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 14 2022Application (22A20) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 2, 2022.
Aug 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2022.
Nov 02 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Nov 22 2022Reply of petitioner Adam Samia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 25 2023Brief of petitioner Adam Samia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 29, 2023.
Feb 01 2023Amicus brief of National Association of Federal Defenders submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2023Amicus brief of Retired federal judges and former federal prosecutors submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2023Amicus brief of New York Council of Defense Lawyers submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2023Amicus brief of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and American Civil Liberties Union submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2023Motion of Law Professors for leave to file amicus brief submitted.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Adam Samia
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

GINGER.ANDERS@MTO.COM
2022201107
Party name: Retired federal judges and former federal prosecutors
Brandon W. Duke
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
800 Capitol Street
Suite 2400
Houston, TX 77002-5242

BDUKE@WINSTON.COM
7136512636
Party name: Law Professors
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

JELLIS@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
919-755-6688
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and American Civil Liberties Union
Michael Robert Huston
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street, N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

mhuston@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1630
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

HSANDICK@PBWT.COM
(212)336-2000
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers