No. 22-195
Title:Thomas J. Dart, et al., Petitioners
v.
Salvatore Ziccarelli
Docketed:September 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3435)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Waiver of right of respondent Salvatore Ziccarelli to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathon Delmar Byrer
    Counsel of Record
Cook County State's Attorney's Office
500 Richard J. Daley Center
Chicago, IL 60602

jonathon.byrer@cookcountyil.gov
312-603-4366
Party name: Thomas Dart, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Ave.
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Salvatore Ziccarelli