No. 22-193 | |
Title: | Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow, Petitioner v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al. |
Docketed: | August 31, 2022 |
Linked with 21A835 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-2975) |
Decision Date: | April 4, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 15 2022 | Application (21A835) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 21 2022 | Application (21A835) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 1, 2022. |
Aug 29 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 28 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent City of St. Louis, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 30 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 30 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022. |
Oct 11 2022 | Response Requested. (Due November 10, 2022) |
Oct 31 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 10, 2022 to December 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2022. |
Dec 12 2022 | Brief of respondents City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 19 2022 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
Jan 09 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
May 18 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian Wolfman Counsel of Record | Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic 600 New Jersey Avenue Suite 312 Washington, DC 20001 wolfmanb@georgetown.edu | 202-661-6582 |
Party name: Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Sheena Renee Hamilton Counsel of Record | City of St. Louis Civil Law Department 1200 Market Street, Room 314 St. Louis, MO 63103 HamiltonS@stlouis-mo.gov | 314-622-3361 |
Party name: City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Brianne Jenna Gorod Counsel of Record | Constitutional Accountability Center 1200 18th Street, NW Suite 501 Washington, DC 20036 brianne@theusconstitution.org | 202 296 6889 |
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center | ||
Carolyn L. Wheeler Counsel of Record | Katz Banks Kumin LLP 11 Dupont Circle Suite 600 Washington, DC 20036 wheeler@katzbanks.com | (202) 299-1140 |
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association |