No. 22-187
Title:County of Orange, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kathy Craig, et al.
Docketed:August 30, 2022
Linked with 21A848
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55324, 19-56188)
   Decision Date:August 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:March 31, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2022Application (21A848) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2022 to August 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Application (21A848) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2022.
Aug 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 29, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kathy Craig, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Oct 05 2022Response Requested. (Due November 4, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shelton Franklin Harrell
    Counsel of Record
Lynberg & Watkins
1100 Town & County Road
Suite 1450
Orange, CA 92868

sharrell@lynberg.com
714-937-1010
Party name: County of Orange, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-339-8497
Party name: Kathy Craig, et al.