No. 22-186
Title:Troy Mansfield, Petitioner
v.
Williamson County, Texas
Docketed:August 30, 2022
Linked with 21A827
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50331)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2022Application (21A827) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 29, 2022 to August 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 16 2022Application (21A827) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 26, 2022.
Aug 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 29, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Troy Mansfield
Blanket Consent
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2022 to October 31, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2022.
Sep 29 2022Brief amici curiae of Gov. Tom Corbett, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Federal and State Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Texas Civil Rights Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Colin Miller filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brandon W. Duke
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
800 Capitol Street
Suite 2400
Houston, TX 77002-5242

bduke@winston.com
7136512636
Party name: Troy Mansfield
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric J. R. Nichols
    Counsel of Record
Butler Snow LLP
1400 Lavaca St
Suite 1000
Austin, TX 78701

eric.nichols@butlersnow.com
7378021807
Party name: Williamson County
Other
Joel David Bertocchi
    Counsel of Record
Akerman LLP
71 S. Wacker Dr., 47th floor
Chicago, IL 60606

joel.bertocchi@akerman.com
(312) 634 5700
Party name: The Texas Civil Rights Project
Daniel L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112-0015

dlbrown@sheppardmullin.com
2126538700
Party name: Professor Colin Miller
Benjamin Gruenstein
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

bgruenstein@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Former Federal and State Judges
Bradley Edward Oppenheimer
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

boppenheimer@kellogghansen.com
2023267968
Party name: Gov. Tom Corbett, José Garza, and H. Joseph Pinto III
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Law Professors