No. 22-183
Title:Bryan Cowan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Masa Nathaniel, Warden
Docketed:August 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17405)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2022Waiver of right of respondent Masa Nathaniel Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick Leslie Deedon
    Counsel of Record
Maire & Deedon
2851 Park Marina Drive, Suite 300
Redding, CA 96001

pdeedon@maire-law.com
(530) 246-6050
Party name: Bryan Cowan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Curtis McComas
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of B.C. McComas
PMB 1605, 77 Van Ness Ave., Ste. 101
San Francisco, CA 94102

mccomas.b.c@gmail.com
2083200383
Party name: Masa Nathaniel Warden