No. 22-181
Title:Resurrection School, et al., Petitioners
v.
Elizabeth Hertel, Director, Michigan Department of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:August 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2256)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Waiver of right of respondent Dana Nessel, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Michigan to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 13 2022Waiver of right of respondent Elizabeth Hertel, Director, Michigan Department of Health and Human Services to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 28 2022Brief amici curiae of California Rental Housing Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Law Center
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Dr.
Ann Arbor, MI 48105

emersino@thomasmore.org
734-827-2001
Party name: Resurrection School, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Fadwa A. Hammoud
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

HammoudF1@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Dana Nessel, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Michigan
Daniel J. PingMichigan Department of Attorney General
525 W. Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30736
Lansing, MI 48872

PingD@michigan.gov
517-335-7632
Party name: Elizabeth Hertel, Director, Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
Bonnie G. ToskeyCohl, Stoker & Toskey, P.C.
601 N. Capitol Avenue
Lansing, MI 48933

btoskey@cstmlaw.com
517-372-9000
Party name: Linda Vail, Ingham County Health Officer; and Caol A. Siemon, Ingham County Prosecuting Attorney
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: California Rental Housing Association, et al.