No. 22-18
Title:Cuker Interactive, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
Docketed:July 6, 2022
Linked with 21A748
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55298)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2022Application (21A748) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 31, 2022 to June 30, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 23 2022Application (21A748) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 30, 2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2022 to August 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 15, 2022.
Aug 05 2022Amicus brief of Professors of Law submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe Street
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: Cuker Interactive, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

dan.bromberg@pillsburylaw.com
(415) 477-4716
Party name: Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
Other
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
370 17th Street
Suite 4500
Denver, CO 80202

yarger@wtotrial.com
3032441800
Party name: Professors of Law