No. 22-179
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Helaman Hansen
Docketed:August 29, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10548)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 25, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2022 to October 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2022.
Sep 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2022Brief of respondent Helaman Hansen in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2022Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022.
Dec 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Dec 09 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 18 2023Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pfizer Inc. in suppoprt of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2023Brief amici curiae of State of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 27, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn Mary Wiggin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender, E.D. Cal.
801 "I" Street
Third Floor
Sacamento, CA 95814

carolyn_wiggin@fd.org
(916) 498-5700
Party name: Helaman Hansen
Other
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

DOUGLAS.HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER@ROPESGRAY.COM
202-508-4776
Party name: Pfizer Inc.
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

LJOSEPH@LARRYJOSEPH.COM
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana
Linley Sarah Wilson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

linley.wilson@azag.gov
(602) 542-8584
Party name: Arizona, et al.